Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ignatius Brouwer, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1850Born
18 Nov 187727.2Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
1887¹36.4AppointedPrefect of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan
1894¹43.4ResignedPrefect of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan
14 Jun 192675.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Brouwer
Father Ignatius Brouwer M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kafiristan e Kashmir

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFriesland, Netherlands
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Highgate, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceRentachintala

  • a priest for 48.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 1 Nov 2017