Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joannes van Breugel

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Adrana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1802Born
31 Jan 184946.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands
31 Jan 184946.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrana
15 Jan 185047.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Joannes van Breugel
Father Joannes van Breugel (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast