Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Bricennio (Brisseno)

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513²Born
5 Nov 158269.8AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
1 May 158370.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
11 Aug 158875.6DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Bricennio (Brisseno)
Bishop Bernardino Bricennio (Brisseno) (born 1513, died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 334
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast