Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Petrus Brask

Deceased

Bishop of Linköping, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Apr 1513AppointedBishop of Linköping, Sweden
7 Aug 1513Ordained BishopBishop of Linköping, Sweden
1 Aug 1538DiedBishop of Linköping, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Johannes Petrus Brask
Bishop Johannes Petrus Brask (died ) Bishop of Linköping

EventPlace
Death PlacePoland

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,513, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast