Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iņigo Brizuela Artiaga, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹BornBerlanga
12 Feb 162261.1SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
6 May 162261.3ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
7 Aug 162261.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
1624²63.0ResignedBishop of Segovia, Spain
12 Jan 162968.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iņigo Brizuela Artiaga:
Bishop Iņigo Brizuela Artiaga O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segovia

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,388
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,832
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 310
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 142, Number 902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015