Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Albrecht von Brandenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Bishop of Halberstadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1499Born
2 Oct 152122.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Halberstadt, Germany
152323.2SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
18 Dec 152324.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
1524¹24.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
24 Sep 154546.0SucceededBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
24 Sep 154546.0SucceededArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
17 May 155050.6DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Albrecht von Brandenburg
Archbishop Johann Albrecht von Brandenburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnsbach

  • a bishop for 26.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232, and Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,521, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast