Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Branicki Korczack

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1484¹Born
27 Oct 153551.8AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
29 Jul 153854.5AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
9 Sep 153955.6AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
6 May 154460.3DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Branicki Korczack
Bishop Sebastian Branicki Korczack (born 1484, died ) Bishop of Poznań

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017