Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guglielmo di Brandeburgo

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1531AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Riga, Latvia
10 Aug 1539SucceededArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
4 Feb 1563DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo di Brandeburgo
Archbishop Guglielmo di Brandeburgo (died ) Archbishop of Riga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast