Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sewall de Bovill

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1256AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
23 Jul 1256Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
10 May 1258DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Sewall de Bovill
Archbishop Sewall de Bovill (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYork, Archdiocese of York, England

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 102
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast