Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bourghill, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Apr 1396AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
10 Jul 1396Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
12 Jul 1398AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
20 May 1414³DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for John Bourghill:
Bishop John Bourghill O.P. (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 552
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 208, and Page 292
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 248
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013