Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald Boulers

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1450AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
14 Feb 1451Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
7 Feb 1453AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
10 Apr 1459³DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reginald Boulers:
Bishop Reginald Boulers (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 465, and Page 554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 163, and Page 135
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013