Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father François-Xavier Bossé

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1838Born
4 Oct 186325.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 188243.7AppointedPrefect of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
189253.3ResignedPrefect of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
191273.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Bossé
Father François-Xavier Bossé (born , died 1912) Prefect Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière

  • a priest for 48.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast