Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Bosnyák

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1640AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
21 Nov 1642SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
5 Sep 1644SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
23 Sep 1644DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Bosnyák:
Bishop István Bosnyák (died ) Bishop of Pécs

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 260, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015