Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Borro

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1697BornCagliari
13 Mar 172325.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 176366.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
Jan 176769.4DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Borro:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Borro (born ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013