Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Bornemissza

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1550AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
3 Aug 1554AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
17 Jul 1560AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
1579²DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pál Bornemissza
Bishop Pál Bornemissza (died 1579) Bishop of Nitra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 259, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 27 Oct 2017