Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Borgia

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1633Born
12 Jun 167744.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 168248.9AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
11 Aug 168350.5DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Borgia
Bishop Girolamo Borgia (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 392
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,682, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast