Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea de Bondelmonte

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1532AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
8 Dec 1532Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
27 Nov 1542DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea de Bondelmonte
Archbishop Andrea de Bondelmonte (died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCamaldules, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1532, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast