Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Girolamo Bona

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Archbishop of Cartagine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1687BornRagusa
17 Mar 172739.3AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Jun 173143.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
18 Jun 173143.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
16 Feb 175062.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Girolamo Bona:
Archbishop Francesco Girolamo Bona (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 62
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015