Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Bole, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1457AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
12 Jun 1457³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
18 Feb 1471DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Bole
Archbishop John Bole C.R.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 13.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 95
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 Aug 2018

Quantcast