Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogufal (Boguchfal)

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1242AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
10 Aug 1242Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
9 Feb 1253DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bogufal (Boguchfal)
Bishop Bogufal (Boguchfal) (died ) Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,176
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast