Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Boccamazzi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy

Titular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1813Born
23 Jun 189077.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy
23 Jun 189077.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
24 Aug 189683.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Angelo Boccamazzi
Bishop Angelo Boccamazzi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTufara, Archdiocese of Benevento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017