Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr z Bnina Moszyński

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹Born
10 Dec 148151.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
20 Oct 148353.8AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
7 Mar 149464.2DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr z Bnina Moszyński:
Bishop Piotr z Bnina Moszyński (died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 219, and Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013