Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Bianchi

Deceased

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹Born
22 May 162346.3AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
1 Oct 163558.7AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
14 Nov 164467.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sapë, Albania
16 Oct 164669.7DiedBishop of Sapë, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Bianchi
Archbishop Giorgio Bianchi (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSappa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 305, and Page 86
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast