Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Blankenfeld

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Oct 1514AppointedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
19 Jun 1518AppointedBishop of Dorpat (Tartu), Estonia
11 May 1523AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Riga, Latvia
29 Jun 1524SucceededArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
9 Sep 1527DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Johann Blankenfeld
Archbishop Johann Blankenfeld (died ) Archbishop of Riga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308, and Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Sep 2017