Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Blacader

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1480AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Mar 1483AppointedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
May 1483²Ordained BishopBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Jan 1492AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Jul 1508DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Blacader
Archbishop Robert Blacader (died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

  • a bishop for 25.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1480, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast