Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Bienna

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Otranto

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1794³BornOtranto
19 Sep 181824.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 184550.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Otranto, Italy
24 Apr 184550.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
2 Jul 188288.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bienna:
Bishop Luigi Bienna (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Otranto

  • a priest for 63.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013