Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Bertrand

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1557AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
31 Jul 1558Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
3 Sep 1563DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Bertrand
Bishop Pierre Bertrand (died ) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMontpensier

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,458
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast