Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Berruyer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1449AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
2 Apr 1452Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
1465¹ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
23 Apr 1466DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Berruyer
Bishop Martin Berruyer (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNoyon, Diocese of Noyon
Death PlaceTouvoye, Château

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 124
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,128
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1452, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast