Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pey Berland

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux, France

Titular Archbishop of Madytus


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1430AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
25 Dec 1430Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
24 Sep 1456ResignedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
24 Sep 1456AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madytus

MicroData Summary for Pey Berland
Archbishop Pey Berland , Archbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,126
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 151
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112, and Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Dec 2018

Quantcast