Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Berghes

Deceased

Bishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1480AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
1 Oct 1480Ordained BishopBishop of Cambrai, France
7 Oct 1502DiedBishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Berghes
Bishop Henri de Berghes (died ) Bishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBruxelles

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 115
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,480, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast