Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Bergés

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1612³BornValencia
17 May 163624.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 166653.9AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
21 Jun 167866.2DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Bergés:
Bishop José Bergés (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a priest for 42.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 265
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 202, Number 1,264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015