Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Petros Berga

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Priest of Haarlem-Amsterdam

Titular See: Faithful of the Alexandrian Ge’ez rite resident in Europe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1967 Born
1998²30.0Ordained PriestPriest of Haarlem, Netherlands
7 Jan 202052.0AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petros Berga
Father Petros Berga (born ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAddis Abeba, Ethiopia

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast