Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Berga

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1172AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
19 Aug 1172Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
6 Aug 1188DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Berga
Bishop Fernando de Berga (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 293, Number 66
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast