Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jacobo Bencomo y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1754BornLa Laguna
10 Jul 181763.0SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
1 Oct 181763.2ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Mar 181863.6DiedBishop-Elect of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jacobo Bencomo y Rodríguez:
Priest Jacobo Bencomo y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Astorga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013