Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Becchi, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1411¹Born
17 May 147059.3AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
1481²70.0ResignedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
1491²80.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Fiesole, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Becchi (VIAF: 42231989)
Bishop Guglielmo Becchi O.S.A. (born 1411, died 1491) Bishop Emeritus of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 24 Apr 2014
  • bd/d: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 154
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast