Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles-Jean-François de Beauvau du Rivau

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹Born
5 Jul 167725.5SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
17 Jul 167927.5ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
24 Aug 167927.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
6 Sep 171765.6DiedBishop of Nantes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilles-Jean-François de Beauvau du Rivau
Bishop Gilles-Jean-François de Beauvau du Rivau (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a bishop for 38.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast