Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lodovico Beccadelli (Beccatelli)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1501BornBologna
27 May 154948.3AppointedBishop of Ravello, Italy
4 Mar 155049.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
16 Jun 155453.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
19 Sep 155554.6AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
1564¹62.9ResignedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
17 Oct 157271.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Beccadelli (Beccatelli) (VIAF: 88988256)
Archbishop Lodovico Beccadelli (Beccatelli) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281, and Page 282
  • b: CB, 2 Nov 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016