Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Battucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1773¹Born
13 Jan 182451.0AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
20 Jun 182451.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
6 Mar 185279.1DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Battucci
Archbishop Vincent Battucci (born 1773, died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrë

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 78
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast