Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giosafatte (Giosafat) Battistelli

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1659³BornPalazzo
8 Jun 170546.2AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
10 May 171758.1AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
21 Mar 173576.0DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giosafatte (Giosafat) Battistelli:
Bishop Giosafatte (Giosafat) Battistelli (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206, and Page 334
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015