Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bassi

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1645Born
10 Aug 168943.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Aug 168943.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 170862.9AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
19 Dec 173691.1DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bassi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bassi (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeletto

  • a priest for 47.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 83
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast