Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Bassdonna

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617Born
12 Jun 167356.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 167457.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
6 Oct 168467.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bassdonna
Pietro Cardinal Bassdonna (born 1617, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018