Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Barton

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1514AppointedBishop of Lectoure, France
24 Jan 1530AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
21 Sep 1544DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

MicroData Summary for Jean de Barton
Archbishop Jean de Barton (died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 221, and Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 1 May 2018

Quantcast