Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Bartolini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Official of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1813BornRome, Italy
15 Mar 187561.8Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 187561.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
3 Apr 187662.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
15 Jul 187865.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
15 Jan 188672.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
2 Oct 188774.4DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bartolini:
Cardinal Domenico Bartolini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

  • a cardinal for 12.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50, and Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013