Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Barthon

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Nazareth


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1457SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
18 May 1457ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
10 Mar 1484AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazareth
1486¹DiedTitular Bishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Barthon
Bishop Jean de Barthon (died 1486) Titular Bishop of Nazareth

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 200, and Page 175
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast