Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Barth

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1764Born
1790²25.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 181752.9AppointedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Nov 181854.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Oct 184479.9DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Barth
Father Louis Barth (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Buried Place (Original)Trinity Church, Cemetery, Georgetown, DC

  • a priest for 54.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817
  • b: CB, 27 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017