Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Barsony

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1626BornPeterfalva
19 Jul 166337.3SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
22 Apr 166539.1ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
18 Jan 167851.8DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Georges Barsony:
Bishop Georges Barsony (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015