Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Barberá, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1248AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
8 Mar 1248Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
17 Apr 1255DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Barberá:
Bishop Guillermo Barberá O.P. (died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 283
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 296, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 23 Feb 2014