Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Daniele Matteo Alvise Barbaro

Deceased

Patriarch-Elect of Aquileia, Italy

Titular See: (never consecrated a bishop nor published a cardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1514Born
17 Dec 155036.8AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
26 Feb 156147.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Apr 157056.1DiedPatriarch-Elect of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniele Matteo Alvise Barbaro (VIAF: 4959495)
Father Daniele Matteo Alvise Barbaro (born , died ) Patriarch-Elect of Aquileia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco della Vigna, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a cardinal for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 114
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 49*
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 2 Oct 2017