Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthelemy Barbarigo

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1467AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
9 Nov 1467Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
11 Oct 1471AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
1475¹DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Barthelemy Barbarigo
Bishop Barthelemy Barbarigo (died 1475) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 232, and Page 212
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,494
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1467, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast