Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlos Antonio Ávila Mártinez, O.P.

Superior Emeritus of Tadjikistan

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

Titular See: (I.V.E.: Comunita del Verbo Incarnato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1964 Born
8 Dec 199026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Other
29 Sep 199733.1AppointedSuperior of Tadjikistan
19 Sep 201349.1ResignedSuperior of Tadjikistan
14 Sep 201955.0Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

MicroData Summary for Carlos Antonio Ávila Mártinez
Father Carlos Antonio Ávila Mártinez O.P. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Tadjikistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tadjikistan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 5 Aug 2020

Quantcast